US SB1756 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Energy Efficiency Act of 2015 This bill amends the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to allow a state development company to use the economic development objective of helping small businesses achieve savings through energy efficiency to qualify for loan assistance.
Title
Small Business Energy Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-20 | Senate | By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-408. |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 223. |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Vitter without amendment. Without written report. |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Subjects
Commerce
Economic development
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government lending and loan guarantees
Small business
Economic development
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government lending and loan guarantees
Small business