US SB164 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-6)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Withholding Tax Relief Act of 2011- Repeals the provision of the Tax Increase Prevention and Reconciliation Act of 2005 requiring federal, state, and local governmental entities to withhold 3% of payments due to vendors providing goods and services to such entities. Rescinds permanently $39 billion of appropriated but unobligated discretionary funds. Exempts unobligated funds of the Department of Defense (DOD) or the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to determine and identify from which appropriation accounts such rescissions shall apply and report to the Secretary of the Treasury and Congress on such rescissions.
Title
Withholding Tax Relief Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] |
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB89 (Related) 2011-02-11 - Star Print ordered on on the bill.
HB674 (Related) 2011-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 112-56.
SB1720 (Related) 2011-10-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 203.
SB1726 (Related) 2011-10-20 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the bill not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 43. Record Vote Number: 178. (consideration: CR S6840-6841; text: CR S6840)
SB1762 (Related) 2011-10-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1885 (Related) 2011-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB674 (Related) 2011-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 112-56.
SB1720 (Related) 2011-10-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 203.
SB1726 (Related) 2011-10-20 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the bill not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 43. Record Vote Number: 178. (consideration: CR S6840-6841; text: CR S6840)
SB1762 (Related) 2011-10-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1885 (Related) 2011-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Appropriations
Employment taxes
Public contracts and procurement
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Employment taxes
Public contracts and procurement
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/164/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s164/BILLS-112s164is.pdf |