US SB1603 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-179.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-179.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gun Lake Trust Land Reaffirmation Act - Ratifies and confirms the actions of the Secretary of the Interior in taking specified land into trust for the benefit of the Match-E-Be-Nash-She-Wish Band of Pottawatami Indians. Reaffirms that land as trust land. Prohibits an action relating to that land from being filed or maintained in a federal court.
Title
Gun Lake Trust Land Reaffirmation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-16 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 359 N: 64 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-179. |
2014-09-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-09-18 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-09-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 359 - 64 (Roll no. 503). (text: CR 9/16/2014 H7485) |
2014-09-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7577-7578) |
2014-09-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-09-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1603. |
2014-09-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7485) |
2014-09-15 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-09-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 437. |
2014-09-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-590. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-30 | House | Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2014-07-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2014-06-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2014-06-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3884; text as passed Senate: CR S3884) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 113-194. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 432. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2013-10-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |