US SB160 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a new criminal offense for performing or attempting to perform an abortion if the probable post-fertilization age of the fetus is 20 weeks or more. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to five years, or both. The bill provides exceptions for an abortion (1) that is necessary to save the life of the pregnant woman, or (2) when the pregnancy is the result of rape or incest. A physician who performs or attempts to perform an abortion under an exception must comply with specified requirements. A woman who undergoes a prohibited abortion may not be prosecuted for violating or conspiring to violate the provisions of this bill.
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB784 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB3275 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 57. (CR S1136)
SB3275 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 57. (CR S1136)
Subjects
Abortion
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Women's health
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/160/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s160/BILLS-116s160is.pdf |