US SB1599 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 to prohibit an employer from discharging, demoting, suspending, harassing, or in any other manner discriminating against an employee, contractor, subcontractor, or agent of such employer (covered individual) who by a lawful act: (1) provided information to the employer or a federal regulatory or law enforcement agency, or any Member of Congress or congressional committee concerning a violation of antitrust law or of another criminal law committed in conjunction with a potential violation of antitrust law or in conjunction with an antitrust investigation by the Department of Justice; or (2) filed or caused to be filed, testified, participated, or otherwise assisted in a federal investigation or proceeding relating to such a violation. This protection does not extend, however, to any covered individual who planned and initiated such a violation or an obstruction to its investigation. A violation with respect to the antitrust laws shall not be construed to include a civil violation of any law that is not also a criminal violation. A covered individual who alleges discharge or other discrimination by an employer in violation of such prohibition is authorized to seek relief: (1) by filing a complaint with the Department of Labor; or (2) if Labor has not issued a final decision within 180 days of such filing, by bringing an action at law or equity in the appropriate U.S. district court. A covered individual who prevails in any such action is entitled to all relief necessary to make the individual whole, including reinstatement with the same status, back pay plus interest, and compensation for special damages sustained.
Title
Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-07-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5474-5475; text as passed Senate: CR S5474) |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 151. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4252) |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Competition and antitrust
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Competition and antitrust
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Employment discrimination and employee rights