US SB1589 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - By Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-47. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Damon Paul Nelson and Matthew Young Pollard Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Years 2018, 2019, and 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Damon Paul Nelson and Matthew Young Pollard Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Years 2018, 2019, and 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateBy Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-47. Additional views filed.
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 97.
2019-05-22SenateSelect Committee on Intelligence. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Burr. Without written report.

Same As/Similar To

HB690 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB174 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB245 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
SB314 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
SB838 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback