US HB3476 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
Pending: House Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
Pending: House Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the sense of Congress that elements of the intelligence community are obligated to notify Congress upon discovering that an individual in the executive branch has disclosed, outside established intelligence channels, certain classified information to specified adversary foreign governments (North Korea, Iran, China, Russia, and Cuba).
Title
POISE Act Prevention and Oversight of Intelligence Sharing with Enemies Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select). |
2019-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB245 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
SB1589 (Related) 2019-06-11 - By Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-47. Additional views filed.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1589 (Related) 2019-06-11 - By Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-47. Additional views filed.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Caribbean area
China
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Cuba
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Iran
Middle East
North Korea
Russia
Asia
Caribbean area
China
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Cuba
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Iran
Middle East
North Korea
Russia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3476/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3476/BILLS-116hr3476ih.pdf |