US SB1555 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-26-2)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-26-2)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Filipino Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2015 (Sec. 3) This bill defines "Filipino Veterans of World War II" to include an individual who served: honorably at any time from July 26, 1941, to December 31, 1946; in an active-duty status under the command of the U.S. Armed Forces in the Far East; and within the Philippine Commonwealth Army, the Philippine Scouts, the Philippine Constabulary, Recognized Guerrilla units, the New Philippine Scouts, the First Filipino Infantry Regiment, the Second Filipino Infantry Battalion (Separate), or the First Reconnaissance Battalion; or
Title
Filipino Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-265. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-07 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H7020-7021) |
2016-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1555. |
2016-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7020-7024) |
2016-11-30 | House | Mr. Huizenga (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-07-14 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2016-07-14 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2016-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-07-14 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5092-5094) |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5092-5094) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2737 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Referred to House Administration
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Philippines
Smithsonian Institution
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Philippines
Smithsonian Institution
Veterans' organizations and recognition