US SB1514 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HELP for Wildlife Act Hunting Heritage and Environmental Legacy Preservation for Wildlife

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HELP for Wildlife Act Hunting Heritage and Environmental Legacy Preservation for Wildlife

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-05SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
2017-10-05SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-168. Additional and Minority views filed.
2017-07-26SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
2017-07-19SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-77.
2017-06-29SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB424 (Related) 2018-01-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 361.
HB788 (Related) 2018-05-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546.
SB478 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB593 (Related) 2018-11-15 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-372. Additional views filed.
SB1214 (Related) 2017-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1436 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1513 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1537 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-350.
HB4489 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Agricultural practices and innovations
Animals
Aquatic ecology
Birds
Canada
Chesapeake Bay
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Firearms and explosives
Fishes
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Great Lakes
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Michigan
Minnesota
Outdoor recreation
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Tax-exempt organizations
Trade restrictions
Water quality
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wisconsin
Wyoming

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback