US HB788 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 55-7)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act This bill amends the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to facilitate the construction and expansion of public target ranges by: (1) authorizing a state to pay up to 90% of the costs of acquiring land for, expanding, or constructing a public target range; (2) authorizing a state to elect to allocate 10% of a specified amount apportioned to it from the federal aid to wildlife restoration fund for those costs; (3) limiting the federal share of those costs under such Act to 90%; and (4) requiring amounts provided for those costs under such Act to remain available for expenditure and obligation for five fiscal years. The United States shall be shielded from any civil action or claim for money damages for injury to or loss of property, personal injury, or death caused by an activity occurring at a public target range that is funded by the federal government pursuant to such Act or located on federal land, except to the extent provided under the Federal Tort Claims Act with respect to the exercise or performance of a discretionary function. The bill urges the Forest Service and the Bureau of Land Management to cooperate with state and local authorities and other entities to carry out waste removal and other activities on any federal land used as a public target range to encourage its continued use for target practice or marksmanship training.
Title
Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546. |
2018-05-29 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2018-05-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-707, Part I. |
2018-04-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-18 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB593 (Same As) 2018-11-15 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-372. Additional views filed.
SB1514 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
HB4489 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1514 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
HB4489 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Firearms and explosives
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection