US HB424 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 361.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 361.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gray Wolf State Management Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of the Interior to reissue two rules that removed protections under the Endangered Species Act of 1973 for the gray wolf populations located in Wyoming and the western Great Lakes (all of Wisconsin, Michigan, and Minnesota, as well as portions of North Dakota, South Dakota, Iowa, Illinois, Indiana, and Ohio). In addition, this bill prohibits judicial review of the reissued rules.
Title
Gray Wolf State Management Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] |
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 361. |
2018-01-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-487. |
2017-10-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 15. |
2017-10-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-19 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB164 (Related) 2017-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1514 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
SB1514 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Animals
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Judicial review and appeals
Mammals
Michigan
Minnesota
Wisconsin
Wyoming
Animals
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Judicial review and appeals
Mammals
Michigan
Minnesota
Wisconsin
Wyoming