US SB1500 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keeping Capital Local for Underserved Communities Act of 2017
Title
Keeping Capital Local for Underserved Communities Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2403 (Related) 2017-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Finance and financial sector
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Finance and financial sector
Interest, dividends, interest rates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1500/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1500/BILLS-115s1500is.pdf |