US HB2403 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keeping Capital Local for Underserved Communities Act of 2017
Title
Keeping Capital Local for Underserved Communities Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1500 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Finance and financial sector
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Finance and financial sector
Interest, dividends, interest rates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2403/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2403/BILLS-115hr2403ih.pdf |