US SB1294 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission, the National Telecommunications and Information Administration, and the Department of Agriculture to enter into an interagency agreement to coordinate the distribution of federal funds for new broadband deployment.
Title
Broadband Interagency Coordination Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 311. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-162. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4283 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Subjects
Internet and video services
Public participation and lobbying
Public utilities and utility rates
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Public participation and lobbying
Public utilities and utility rates
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees