US SB125 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-155. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-155. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program Reauthorization Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to extend through FY2020 the authorization of appropriations for the Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program. (Sec. 3) Requires the transfer to the Treasury, no later than January 31, 2023, of all funds appropriated for such Program for FY2016-FY2020 that are not obligated on or before December 31, 2022. (Sec. 4) Expresses the sense of Congress that amounts made available to carry out such Program should be made available through the end of the fiscal year following the one for which the amounts are appropriated and should not be made available until expended. (Sec. 5) Prohibits a state, local government, or Indian tribe from using any funding under another grant program to pay or defer the cost of the matching fund requirement for such Program. (Sec. 6) Requires a grantee under such Act that uses funds to purchase an armor vest or body armor to comply with any requirements for the use of Program grants, to have a written policy requiring uniformed patrol officers to wear an armor vest or body armor, and to use the funds to purchase vests or body armor that meet performance standards established by the Bureau of Justice Assistance. (Sec. 7) Allows preferential consideration in Program grant awards to jurisdictions that provide armor vests to law enforcement officers that are uniquely fitted for such officers, including individual female officers.
Title
Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program Reauthorization Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-155. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-05-16 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-05-13 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2184-2185) |
2016-05-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 125. |
2016-05-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2184-2186) |
2016-05-10 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 420. |
2016-05-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-544. |
2016-04-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-08 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-05-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2671-2672) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.1214 Amendment SA 1214 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.1214 Amendment SA 1214 proposed by Senator Leahy for Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S2671; text: CR S2671) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2670-2672) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 32. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S101) |
Subjects
Appropriations
Crime and law enforcement
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Worker safety and health
Crime and law enforcement
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Worker safety and health