US SB1222 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 496.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 496.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate and adjust certain lands in the State of Utah as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System, and for other purposes.
Title
Bonneville Shoreline Trail Advancement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 496. |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 117-153. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2551 (Same As) 2022-12-13 - Received in the Senate.