US HB2551 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate and adjust certain lands in the State of Utah as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System, and for other purposes.
Title
Bonneville Shoreline Trail Advancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9679) |
2022-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2551. |
2022-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9678-9680) |
2022-12-12 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 411. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-570. |
2022-01-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-01-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-11-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1222 (Same As) 2022-09-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 496.