US SB119 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new federal crimes related to transporting a minor across state lines for an abortion. It makes it a crime to knowingly transport a minor to another state to obtain an abortion without satisfying a parental involvement law in the minor's resident state. A parental involvement law requires parental consent or notification, or judicial authorization, for a minor to obtain an abortion. The bill prohibits an individual who has committed incest with a minor from knowingly transporting the minor across a state line to receive an abortion. Finally, it makes it a crime for a physician to knowingly perform or induce an abortion on an out-of-state minor without first complying with parental notification requirements.
Title
Child Interstate Abortion Notification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB611 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB194 (Related) 2019-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2817 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB194 (Related) 2019-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2817 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Abortion
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Family relationships
Health personnel
Separation, divorce, custody, support
State and local government operations
Teenage pregnancy
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Family relationships
Health personnel
Separation, divorce, custody, support
State and local government operations
Teenage pregnancy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/119/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s119/BILLS-116s119is.pdf |