US HB611 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new federal crimes related to transporting a minor across state lines for an abortion. It makes it a crime to knowingly transport a minor to another state to obtain an abortion without satisfying a parental involvement law in the minor's resident state. A parental involvement law requires parental consent or notification, or judicial authorization, for a minor to obtain an abortion. The bill prohibits an individual who has committed incest with a minor from knowingly transporting the minor across a state line to receive an abortion. Finally, it makes it a crime for a physician to knowingly perform or induce an abortion on an out-of-state minor without first complying with parental notification requirements.
Title
Child Interstate Abortion Notification Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB119 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB194 (Related) 2019-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2817 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB194 (Related) 2019-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2817 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Abortion
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Family relationships
Health personnel
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Teenage pregnancy
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Family relationships
Health personnel
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Teenage pregnancy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/611/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr611/BILLS-116hr611ih.pdf |