US SB1171 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Controlled Substances Act to prohibit a veterinarian who is registered to manufacture or distribute controlled substances from being required to have a separate registration in order to transport and dispense controlled substances in the usual course of veterinary practice at a site other than such veterinarian's principal place of business or professional practice, as long as the site of transporting and dispensing is located in a state where the veterinarian is licensed to practice.
Title
A bill to amend the Controlled Substances Act to allow a veterinarian to transport and dispense controlled substances in the usual course of veterinary practice outside of the registered location.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-01-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2014-01-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S185) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S185) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1528 (Related) 2014-08-01 - Became Public Law No: 113-143.
SB950 (Related) 2013-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB950 (Related) 2013-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Licensing and registrations
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Licensing and registrations
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases