US SB1135 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5841-5843)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5841-5843)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drive America Forward Act of 2009 - Establishes in the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration (NHTSA) a Drive America Forward Program through which the Secretary of Transportation shall: (1) authorize the issuance of an electronic voucher to offset the purchase or lease price for a new fuel efficient automobile upon the surrender of an eligible trade-in vehicle to a participating dealer; (2) certify dealers for Program participation; (3) make electronic payments to them for vouchers they accept between March 30, 2009, and one year after Program implementing regulations are promulgated; (4) provide for the payment of rebates to qualifying persons; and (5) establish and provide for the enforcement of measures to prevent and penalize fraud under the Program. Prescribes requirements, including combined fuel economy, for $3,500 and $4,500 vouchers to offset the purchase or lease price for a qualifying passenger automobile or truck. Limits the number of vouchers to one per customer, including joint registered owners of a single eligible trade-in vehicle. Requires a dealer to certify about each eligible trade-in vehicle that the dealer: (1) has not and will not sell, lease, exchange, or otherwise dispose of the vehicle for use as an automobile in the United States or in any other country; and (2) will transfer the vehicle to an entity that will ensure that the vehicle will be crushed or shredded within the Program period, and has not been, and will not be, sold, leased, exchanged, or otherwise disposed of for use as an automobile anywhere in the world. Makes any person who purchased or leased a new fuel efficient vehicle after March 30, 2009, and before the enactment of this Act eligible for a cash rebate equivalent to the appropriate voucher amount. Prescribes standards which any regulations issued by the Secretary for the Program must meet. Makes it unlawful for any person to knowingly violate this Act or any regulations issued under it, particularly by fraud. Prescribes civil penalties for any such violation. Directs the Secretary to make Program information available on an Internet website and through other means.
Title
Drive America Forward Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Evan Bayh [D-IN] | Sen. Christopher Bond [R-MO] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Sam Brownback [R-KS] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. George Voinovich [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5841-5843) |
Same As/Similar To
HB520 (Related) 2009-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1550 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1606 (Related) 2009-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
HB2640 (Related) 2009-06-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
HB2751 (Related) 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-353.
SB247 (Related) 2009-01-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S396-397)
SB1200 (Related) 2009-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6262-6265)
SB1248 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6554-6556)
HB1550 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1606 (Related) 2009-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
HB2640 (Related) 2009-06-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
HB2751 (Related) 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-353.
SB247 (Related) 2009-01-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S396-397)
SB1200 (Related) 2009-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6262-6265)
SB1248 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6554-6556)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Transportation
Energy efficiency and conservation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Motor vehicles
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/1135/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s1135/BILLS-111s1135is.pdf |