US HB2640 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-15)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Assistance to Recycle and Save Act - Establishes in the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration (NHTSA) a Cash for Clunkers Temporary Vehicle Trade-in Program through which the Secretary of Transportation shall: (1) authorize the issuance of an electronic voucher to offset the purchase or lease price for a new fuel efficient automobile upon the surrender of an eligible trade-in vehicle to a participating dealer; (2) certify dealers for Program participation; (3) make payments to them for vouchers they accept between March 30, 2009, and April 1, 2010; (4) provide for the payment of rebates to qualifying persons; and (5) establish and provide for the enforcement of measures to prevent and penalize fraud under the Program. Prescribes requirements, including combined fuel economy, for $3,500 and $4,500 vouchers to offset the purchase or lease price for a qualifying passenger automobile or truck. Limits the number of vouchers to one per customer, including joint registered owners of a single eligible trade-in vehicle. Requires a dealer to certify that each eligible trade-in vehicle: (1) will be crushed or shredded, or transferred to an entity that will ensure it will be crushed or shredded, within the period of the Program; and (2) has not been, and will not be, sold, leased, exchanged, or otherwise disposed of for use as an automobile in the United States or in any other country. Makes any person who purchased or leased a new fuel efficient vehicle after March 30, 2009, and before the enactment of this Act eligible for a cash rebate equivalent to the appropriate voucher amount. Prescribes standards which any regulations issued by the Secretary for the Program must meet. Makes it unlawful for any person to violate this Act or any regulations issued under it, particularly by fraud. Prescribes civil penalties for any such violation. Directs the Secretary to make Program information available on an Internet website and through other means.
Title
Consumer Assistance to Recycle and Save Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB520 (Related) 2009-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1550 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1606 (Related) 2009-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
HB2751 (Related) 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-353.
SB247 (Related) 2009-01-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S396-397)
SB1135 (Related) 2009-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5841-5843)
SB1200 (Related) 2009-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6262-6265)
SB1248 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6554-6556)
HB1550 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1606 (Related) 2009-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
HB2751 (Related) 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-353.
SB247 (Related) 2009-01-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S396-397)
SB1135 (Related) 2009-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5841-5843)
SB1200 (Related) 2009-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6262-6265)
SB1248 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6554-6556)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer affairs
Department of Transportation
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Motor vehicles
Retail and wholesale trades
Transportation and public works
Consumer affairs
Department of Transportation
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Motor vehicles
Retail and wholesale trades
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2640/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2640/BILLS-111hr2640ih.pdf |