US SB1107 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-06 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-06 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill reauthorizes 14 temporary bankruptcy judgeships in specified judicial districts in Delaware, Florida, Maryland, Michigan, Puerto Rico, Virginia, Nevada, and North Carolina. (Sec. 3) It authorizes the appointment of four additional temporary bankruptcy judges in Delaware, Florida, and Michigan. (Sec. 4) The bill amends the federal judicial code to increase the quarterly fee imposed on certain chapter 11 (reorganization) debtors. Specifically, if the balance in the U.S. Trustee System Fund is less than $200 million, then a debtor with total quarterly disbursements of $1 million or more must pay a quarterly fee equal to $250,000 or 1% of disbursements, whichever is less. It also specifies that for FY2018-FY2022, 98% of the quarterly fees collected must be deposited as offsetting collections to the U.S. Trustee System Fund and 2% must be deposited in the general fund of the Treasury. (Sec. 5) This section amends the federal bankruptcy code to include an unsecured claim by a governmental unit (e.g., a tax claim by the Internal Revenue Service) resulting from the sale, transfer, exchange, or disposition of farming property in chapter 12 bankruptcy (family farmer or fisherman reorganization) proceedings. Such a claim that arises before a debtor's discharge, regardless of whether the claim is pre-petition or post-petition, must be treated as a pre-petition claim, is not entitled to priority status, must be provided for under the bankruptcy plan, and is dischargeable.
Title
Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Motion (Motion to Concur in the House Amendment to the Senate Amendment to H.R. 2266) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-06 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-09-06 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.787 Amendment SA 787 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.787 Amendment SA 787 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S4956) In the nature of a substitute. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4956) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB136 (Related) 2017-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB2266 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-72. (TXT | PDF)
SB632 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1237 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3216; text of measure as introduced: CR S3215-3216)
HR569 (Related) 2017-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2266 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-72. (TXT | PDF)
SB632 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1237 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3216; text of measure as introduced: CR S3215-3216)
HR569 (Related) 2017-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Caribbean area
Delaware
Federal district courts
Florida
Judges
Law
Legal fees and court costs
Maryland
Michigan
Nevada
North Carolina
Puerto Rico
Specialized courts
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virginia
Caribbean area
Delaware
Federal district courts
Florida
Judges
Law
Legal fees and court costs
Maryland
Michigan
Nevada
North Carolina
Puerto Rico
Specialized courts
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virginia