US SB632 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal judicial code to: convert certain temporary bankruptcy judges to permanent bankruptcy judges and authorize the appointment of additional bankruptcy judges in Delaware and Michigan; convert temporary bankruptcy judges to permanent bankruptcy judges in specified judicial districts in Florida, Maryland, Nevada, North Carolina, Puerto Rico, Tennessee, and Virginia; and authorize the appointment of additional bankruptcy judges in the middle district of Florida.
Title
Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Motion (Motion to Concur in the House Amendment to the Senate Amendment to H.R. 2266) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB136 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB2266 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-72. (TXT | PDF)
SB1107 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Held at the desk.
HR569 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2266 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-72. (TXT | PDF)
SB1107 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Held at the desk.
HR569 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Caribbean area
Delaware
Federal district courts
Florida
Judges
Law
Maryland
Michigan
Nevada
North Carolina
Puerto Rico
Specialized courts
Tennessee
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virginia
Caribbean area
Delaware
Federal district courts
Florida
Judges
Law
Maryland
Michigan
Nevada
North Carolina
Puerto Rico
Specialized courts
Tennessee
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virginia