US SB1237 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3216; text of measure as introduced: CR S3215-3216)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3216; text of measure as introduced: CR S3215-3216)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Family Farmer Bankruptcy Clarification Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal bankruptcy code to include an unsecured claim by a governmental unit (e.g., a tax claim by the Internal Revenue Service) resulting from the sale, transfer, exchange, or disposition of farming property in chapter 12 bankruptcy (family farmer or fisherman reorganization) proceedings. Such a claim that arises before a debtor's discharge, regardless of whether the claim is pre-petition or post-petition, must be treated as a pre-petition claim, is not entitled to priority status, must be provided for under the bankruptcy plan, and is dischargeable.
Title
Family Farmer Bankruptcy Clarification Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3216; text of measure as introduced: CR S3215-3216) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1107 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Held at the desk.
HB2266 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-72. (TXT | PDF)
HR569 (Related) 2017-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2266 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-72. (TXT | PDF)
HR569 (Related) 2017-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1237/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1237/BILLS-115s1237is.pdf |