US HR952 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of February 28, 2022, as "Rare Disease Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of February 28, 2022, as "Rare Disease Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E181) |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR523 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S793-794)
SR74 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S869; text: CR S866-867)
SR74 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S869; text: CR S866-867)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/952/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres952/BILLS-117hres952ih.pdf |