US HR940 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Thanks the members of the National Guard for their service in response to the attacks on September 11, 2001, and their continuing role in homeland security and military operations. Supports providing the National Guard with the necessary resources to ensure its readiness. Expresses condolences and gratitude to the families of those members of the National Guard who have lost their lives through their dedication and commitment to the freedom and security of the United States while serving in the National Guard. Honors and supports the compassionate, courageous, and dedicated members of the National Guard who serve a critical role in protecting the United States and its citizens' freedoms and treasured liberties.
Title
Recognizing and honoring the National Guard on the occasion of its 373rd anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-08 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-12-08 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 934). (text: CR 12/7/2009 H13527) | |
2009-12-08 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H13572-13573) | |
2009-12-08 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-12-07 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-12-07 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 940. | |
2009-12-07 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13527-13529) | |
2009-12-07 | Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-12-01 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1740 (Same As) 2010-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Homeland security
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness
National Guard and reserves
New York City
Pennsylvania
Terrorism
Virginia