US HR94 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Stalking Awareness Month. Additionally, it does the following: applauds the efforts of service providers, police, prosecutors, national and community organizations, campuses, and private sector supporters to promote awareness of stalking; encourages increased awareness of stalking and the availability of services for stalking victims; and urges national and community organizations, private businesses, and the media to promote awareness of the crime of stalking through National Stalking Awareness Month.
Title
Raising awareness and encouraging the prevention of stalking by expressing support for the designation of January 2019 as "National Stalking Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR44 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S874; text: CR S870-871)
SR480 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR (01/21/2020) S437)
HR817 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR480 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR (01/21/2020) S437)
HR817 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Law enforcement officers
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Law enforcement officers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/94/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres94/BILLS-116hres94ih.pdf |