US SR480 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR (01/21/2020) S437)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR (01/21/2020) S437)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates January 2020 as National Stalking Awareness Month. Additionally, it does the following: applauds the efforts of service providers, police, prosecutors, national and community organizations, campuses, and private sector supporters to promote awareness of stalking; encourages increased awareness of stalking and the availability of services for stalking victims; and urges national and community organizations, private businesses, and the media to promote awareness of the crime of stalking through National Stalking Awareness Month.
Title
A resolution raising awareness and encouraging the prevention of stalking by designating January 2020 as "National Stalking Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR (01/21/2020) S437) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1235) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S437) |
Same As/Similar To
HR94 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR817 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR44 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S874; text: CR S870-871)
HR817 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR44 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S874; text: CR S870-871)
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Law enforcement officers
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Law enforcement officers