US HR920 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of June as National Gun Violence Awareness Month, and calling on Congress to address gun violence.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of June as National Gun Violence Awareness Month, and calling on Congress to address gun violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-06-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1475 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB2598 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3207 (Related) 2017-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB3464 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Clyburn. Petition No: 115-7. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB3999 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4052 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4240 (Related) 2018-02-26 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Thompson (CA). Petition No: 115-6. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB5087 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5383 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HR373 (Related) 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB2598 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3207 (Related) 2017-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB3464 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Clyburn. Petition No: 115-7. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB3999 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4052 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4240 (Related) 2018-02-26 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Thompson (CA). Petition No: 115-6. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB5087 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5383 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HR373 (Related) 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Assault and harassment offenses
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Justice
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Mental health
Performance measurement
Retail and wholesale trades
Smuggling and trafficking
State and local government operations
Trade restrictions
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Violent crime
Assault and harassment offenses
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Justice
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Mental health
Performance measurement
Retail and wholesale trades
Smuggling and trafficking
State and local government operations
Trade restrictions
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/920/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres920/BILLS-115hres920ih.pdf |