US HR847 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 4664) making appropriations for financial services and general government for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2024, and for other purposes.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 4664) making appropriations for financial services and general government for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2024, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN] |
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution RC# 602 (Y: 217 N: 204 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question RC# 601 (Y: 217 N: 204 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question RC# 601 (Y: 217 N: 204 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-11-07 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 217 - 204 (Roll no. 602). |
2023-11-07 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 204 (Roll no. 601). |
2023-11-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2023-11-07 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 847, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Leger Fernandez demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2023-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 847. |
2023-11-07 | House | Considered as privileged matter. |
2023-11-06 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 47. |
2023-11-06 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4664 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate, with one motion to recommit. |
2023-11-06 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 118-269, by Mrs. Houchin. |
2023-11-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4664 (Related) 2023-11-09 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced further proceedings on H.R. 4664 would be postponed.