US HR785 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-13)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution urges all people in the United States to celebrate National First-Generation College Celebration Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the designation of November 8, 2021, as "National First-Generation College Celebration Day".

Sponsors

Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. David Valadao [R-CA]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2021-11-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR437 (Related) 2021-11-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 11/03/2021 S7723)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback