US HR733 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1170)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1170)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for health and wellness coaches and "National Health and Wellness Coach Recognition Week". Expresses support for the designation of National Health and Wellness Coach Recognition Week and for the efforts of health and wellness coaches.
Title
Expressing support for health and wellness coaches and "National Health and Wellness Coach Recognition Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1170) |
2018-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR121 (Related) 2017-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Physical fitness and lifestyle
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/733/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres733/BILLS-115hres733ih.pdf |