US HR707 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the recognition of October 8, 2021, as "National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day".
Title
Supporting the recognition of October 8, 2021, as "National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR412 (Related) 2021-10-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6993; text: CR S7003-7004)
HR1366 (Related) 2022-09-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR765 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 09/15/2022 CR S4642)
HR1366 (Related) 2022-09-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR765 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 09/15/2022 CR S4642)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/707/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres707/BILLS-117hres707ih.pdf |