US HR654 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of September 17, 2021, as "National Concussion Awareness Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 17, 2021, as "National Concussion Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-09-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR369 (Related) 2021-09-20 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SR766 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S4642-4643)
SR766 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S4642-4643)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/654/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres654/BILLS-117hres654ih.pdf |