US HR628 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Wildlife Refuge Week. The resolution acknowledges the importance of national wildlife refuges for their recreational opportunities and contribution to local economies. Finally, the resolution reaffirms the support of the House of Representatives for wildlife conservation and the National Wildlife Refuge System.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on October 13, 2019, as National Wildlife Refuge Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-10-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR362 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/17/2019 CR S5901-5902)
HR1179 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HR1179 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Subjects
Birds
Commemorative events and holidays
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Commemorative events and holidays
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/628/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres628/BILLS-116hres628ih.pdf |