US HR556 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 95-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Voting Rights Month, encourages people to uphold the right to vote, encourages Congress to pass certain voting rights legislation, recommends the development of a curriculum in public schools and universities regarding voting, encourages the U.S. Postal Service to issue a special Fannie Lou Hamer stamp during the month of September, and invites Congress to allocate funds for public service announcements regarding elections.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the month of September as "National Voting Rights Month".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR309 (Related) 2019-09-12 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5476-5477)
HR1114 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
SR695 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5614-5615)
HR1114 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
SR695 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5614-5615)
Subjects
Civics education
Commemorative events and holidays
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Marketing and advertising
Postal service
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
U.S. history
Voting rights
Commemorative events and holidays
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Marketing and advertising
Postal service
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
U.S. history
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/556/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres556/BILLS-116hres556ih.pdf |