US SR695 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5614-5615)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5614-5615)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates September 2020 as National Voting Rights Month, encourages people to uphold the right to vote, commemorates the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the Nineteenth Amendment to the Constitution, encourages Congress to pass certain voting rights legislation, recommends the development of a curriculum in public schools and universities regarding voting, encourages the U.S. Postal Service to issue a special John R. Lewis stamp during the month of September, and invites Congress to allocate funds for public service announcements regarding elections.
Title
A resolution designating September 2020 as "National Voting Rights Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5614-5615) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1114 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
HR556 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SR309 (Related) 2019-09-12 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5476-5477)
HR556 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SR309 (Related) 2019-09-12 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5476-5477)
Subjects
Appropriations
Civics education
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Georgia
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
House of Representatives
Indian lands and resources rights
Marketing and advertising
Members of Congress
Postal service
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
U.S. history
U.S. Postal Service
Voting rights
Women's rights
Civics education
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Georgia
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
House of Representatives
Indian lands and resources rights
Marketing and advertising
Members of Congress
Postal service
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
U.S. history
U.S. Postal Service
Voting rights
Women's rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/695/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres695/BILLS-116sres695is.pdf |