US HR542 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of July 2021 as "American Grown Flower and Foliage Month".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of July 2021 as "American Grown Flower and Foliage Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2021-07-27 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3918-3919) |
2021-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2021-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR318 (Related) 2021-07-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 07/26/2021 CR S5071-5072)
HR1213 (Related) 2022-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
SR720 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3688; text: CR S3697)
HR1213 (Related) 2022-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
SR720 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3688; text: CR S3697)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/542/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres542/BILLS-117hres542ih.pdf |