US HR493 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing Connecticut's Submarine Century, the 100th anniversary of the establishment of Naval Submarine Base New London, and Connecticut's historic role in supporting the undersea capabilities of the United States. Commends the dedication and contribution to the Navy and submarine force by the people of Connecticut, both through the initial deed of gift that established what would become Naval Submarine Base New London and through their ongoing commitment to support the mission of the base and the Navy personnel assigned to it. Honors the submariners who have trained and served at Naval Submarine Base New London throughout its history. Recognizes the contribution of the industry and workforce of Connecticut in designing, building, and sustaining the Navy's submarine fleet. Encourages the recognition of Connecticut's Submarine Century by Congress, the Navy, and the American people.
Title
Recognizing Connecticut's Submarine Century, the 100th anniversary of the establishment of Naval Submarine Base New London, and Connecticut's historic role in supporting the undersea capabilities of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces. |
2015-10-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2015-10-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR298 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S882-883)
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Connecticut
Manufacturing
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Connecticut
Manufacturing
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/493/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres493/BILLS-114hres493ih.pdf |