US HR488 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 88.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 88.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Attorney General to transmit, respectively, certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to the removal of former Federal Bureau of Investigation Director James Comey. Requests the President and directs the U.S. Attorney General to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of any document or communication in their possession that refers or relates to: the removal of James B. Comey from his position as Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation; the participation of Attorney General Jeff Sessions in Comey's removal; the scope or application of Sessions's recusal from investigations of matters related to the presidential campaign and the application of such recusal to Comey's removal; the scope or application of executive privilege as applied to Sessions's testimony before the Senate Select Committee on Intelligence on June 13, 2017; President Trump's Twitter statement on May 12, 2017, that "James Comey better hope that there are no tapes of our conversations before he starts leaking to the press!"; any system used by the White House to secretly record conversations between the President and Comey; any contemporaneous account of any meeting between such individuals; any communication Donald Trump, Jr., Paul Manafort, or Jared Kushner may have had with Sessions or Comey that relates to their June 9, 2016, meeting with Natalia Veselnitskaya, Rinat Akhmetshin, and Irakly Kaveladze; any analysis regarding the violation of any criminal law with respect to such meeting as it may pertain to a federal campaign's attempt to obtain information that would incriminate Hillary Clinton from a foreign government; and the disposition or review of any application for a security clearance submitted by Kushner or Sessions.
Title
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Attorney General to transmit, respectively, certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to the removal of former Federal Bureau of Investigation Director James Comey.
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 88. |
2017-09-28 | House | Reported adversely (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-335. |
2017-09-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported Unfavorably (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 8. |
2017-09-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR446 (Related) 2017-09-08 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 82.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Justice
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Espionage and treason
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Senate Select Committee on Intelligence
Sound recording
Subversive activities
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Justice
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Espionage and treason
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Senate Select Committee on Intelligence
Sound recording
Subversive activities