US HR44 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H665-667)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H665-667)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of as National School Choice Week, and encourages all parents to learn more about the educational options available.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of January 20 through January 26, 2019, as "National School Choice Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H665-667) |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR25 (Related) 2019-01-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S311-312; text: CR S315)
SR478 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S282; text: CR S281)
HR814 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR478 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S282; text: CR S281)
HR814 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/44/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres44/BILLS-116hres44ih.pdf |