US SR25 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S311-312; text: CR S315)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S311-312; text: CR S315)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) designates the week of January 20-January 26, 2019, as National School Choice Week; (2) acknowledges the 15th anniversary of the D.C. Opportunity Scholarship Program; and (2) encourages all parents to learn more about the education options available to them.
Title
A resolution designating the week of January 20 through January 26, 2019, as "National School Choice Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-19 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S311-312; text: CR S315) |
Same As/Similar To
HR44 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H665-667)
SR478 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S282; text: CR S281)
HR814 (Related) 2020-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR478 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S282; text: CR S281)
HR814 (Related) 2020-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
District of Columbia
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
District of Columbia
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/25/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres25/BILLS-116sres25ats.pdf |