US HR431 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2740) making appropriations for the Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 430) authorizing the Committee on the Judiciary to initiate or intervene in judicial proceedings to enforce certain subpoenas and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2740) making appropriations for the Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 430) authorizing the Committee on the Judiciary to initiate or intervene in judicial proceedings to enforce certain subpoenas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2740) making appropriations for the Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 430) authorizing the Committee on the Judiciary to initiate or intervene in judicial proceedings to enforce certain subpoenas and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 246 (Y: 227 N: 190 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 245 (Y: 227 N: 190 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-11HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 190 (Roll no. 246). (text: CR H4402)
2019-06-11HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 190 (Roll no. 245). (consideration: CR H4409-4410)
2019-06-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 431.
2019-06-11HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4402-4411)
2019-06-10HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 28.
2019-06-10HouseThe resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 2740, under a structured rule. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.Res. 430, under a closed rule.
2019-06-10HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-109, by Mr. Raskin.

Same As/Similar To

HB2740 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which the third cloture on the motion to proceed to H.R. 2740 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 342) entered in Senate.
HR431 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR430 (Related) 2019-09-16 - COMMUNICATION TO THE HOUSE - The House received a communication from Jerrold Nadler, Chairman of the Committee on the Judiciary. Chairman Nadler notified the House of the initiation by the Committee on the Judiciary of the following judicial proceedings pursuant to H. Res. 430: 1. In Re: Application of the Committee on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives, for an Order Authorizing the Release of Certain Grand Jury Materials, Misc. no. 1:19-gj-00048-BAH filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia on July 26, 2019. 2. Committee on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives v. McGahn, No. 1:19-cv-2379 filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia on August 7, 2019.
HR436 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback