US HR436 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 2740 (Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2020).
Title
Providing for further consideration of the bill (H.B. 2740) making appropriations for the Departments of Labor, Heath and Human Services, and Education, and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 265 (Y: 232 N: 189 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 264 (Y: 230 N: 184 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 264 (Y: 230 N: 184 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-06-12 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 232 - 189 (Roll no. 265). (text: CR H4445) |
2019-06-12 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 184 (Roll no. 264). (consideration: CR H4583-4584) |
2019-06-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4583-4584) |
2019-06-12 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 436, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question, and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Woodall demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.Res. 436 until later in the legislative day. |
2019-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 436. |
2019-06-12 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4445-4452) |
2019-06-11 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 29. |
2019-06-11 | House | Providing for further consideration of H.R. 2740. |
2019-06-11 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-111, by Mrs. Torres (CA). |
Same As/Similar To
HB2740 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which the third cloture on the motion to proceed to H.R. 2740 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 342) entered in Senate.
HR436 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR436 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.