US HR396 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2842) to provide for the conduct of demonstration projects to test the effectiveness of subsidized employment for TANF recipients, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2842) to provide for the conduct of demonstration projects to test the effectiveness of subsidized employment for TANF recipients, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2842) to provide for the conduct of demonstration projects to test the effectiveness of subsidized employment for TANF recipients, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 316 (Y: 226 N: 184 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 317 (Y: 233 N: 179 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 317 (Y: 233 N: 179 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-22 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 233 - 179 (Roll no. 317). (text: CR H5059) |
2017-06-22 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 226 - 184 (Roll no. 316). (consideration: CR H5066) |
2017-06-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 396. |
2017-06-22 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5059-5067) |
2017-06-21 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 59. |
2017-06-21 | House | The resolution makes in order as original text for the purpose of amendment an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-22. The resolution makes in order only those further amendments printed in the Rules Committee report. Also, the resolution makes in order at any time on the legislative day of June 22, 2017, for the Speaker to entertain motion that the House suspend the rules relating to the bill H.R. 2353. |
2017-06-21 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-187, by Mr. Cole. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2842 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR396 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR396 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.