US HR391 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of July 21, 2021, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
Title
Supporting the designation of July 21, 2021, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR210 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2496; text: CR S2492)
HR1041 (Related) 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR614 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2292; text: CR S2282)
HR1041 (Related) 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR614 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2292; text: CR S2282)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/391/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres391/BILLS-117hres391ih.pdf |