US HR386 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 94-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for recognizing "National Police Week".
Title
Expressing support for recognizing "National Police Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR215 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2531; text: CR S2528-2529)
HR1114 (Same As) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR643 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2580-2581; text: CR S2591-2593)
HR1114 (Same As) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR643 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2580-2581; text: CR S2591-2593)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/386/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres386/BILLS-117hres386ih.pdf |