US HR1114 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 83-10)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for recognizing "National Police Week".
Title
Expressing support for recognizing "National Police Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-05-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR386 (Same As) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR215 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2531; text: CR S2528-2529)
SR643 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2580-2581; text: CR S2591-2593)
SR215 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2531; text: CR S2528-2529)
SR643 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2580-2581; text: CR S2591-2593)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1114/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1114/BILLS-117hres1114ih.pdf |