US HR384 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of May 2023 as Motorcycle Safety Awareness Month.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of May 2023 as Motorcycle Safety Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2023-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR233 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1959; text: CR S1902)
HR1179 (Same As) 2024-04-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
HR1179 (Same As) 2024-04-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/384/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres384/BILLS-118hres384ih.pdf |